Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Valentino Di Cerbo

Bishop of Alife-Caiazzo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Sep 1943 BornFrasso Telesino
30 Mar 196824.5Ordained PriestPriest of Roma {Rome}, Italy
6 Mar 201066.4AppointedBishop of Alife-Caiazzo, Italy
1 May 201066.6Ordained BishopBishop of Alife-Caiazzo, Italy
8 May 201066.6InstalledBishop of Alife-Caiazzo, Italy

MicroData Summary for Valentino Di Cerbo:
Bishop Valentino Di Cerbo (born ) Bishop of Alife-Caiazzo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Alife-Caiazzo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Mar 2010
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 202, Number 16,639

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.1, 18 Dec 2014; Data: 18 Dec 2014