Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Santa, I.M.C. †

Deceased

Bishop of Rimini


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jun 1895BornCastelrosso, Italy
26 Mar 192125.8Ordained PriestPriest of Consolata Missionaries
14 Jul 193439.1AppointedPrefect of Kaffa, Ethiopia
25 Mar 193741.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Metelis
25 Mar 193741.8AppointedVicar Apostolic of Gimma, Ethiopia
21 Sep 193742.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Metelis
Nov 1943³48.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rimini, Italy
17 Jul 194550.1AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
18 May 195358.0DiedBishop of Rimini, Italy

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Santa:
Bishop Luigi Santa I.M.C. (born , died ) Bishop of Rimini

  • a priest for 32.1 years
  • a bishop for 15.7 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Die Apostolische Nachfolge
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1937
  • c2+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1937, Number 55

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013