Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bonaventura Cardinal Cerretti

Deceased

Prefect of the Apostolic Signatura

Cardinal-Bishop of Velletri

Archpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Jun 1872BornBardono, Italy
31 Mar 189522.8Ordained PriestPriest of Orvieto, Italy
15 Apr 191441.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Philippopolis in Thracia
10 May 191441.9AppointedTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
10 May 191441.9AppointedApostolic Delegate to Australia
19 Jul 191442.1Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
5 Oct 191442.3AppointedApostolic Delegate to New Zealand
6 May 191744.9AppointedSecretary of the Congregation for Extraordinary Ecclesiastical Affairs
20 May 192148.9AppointedApostolic Nuncio to France
14 Dec 192553.5Elevated to Cardinal
24 Jun 192654.0AppointedCardinal-Priest of Santa Cecilia
16 Jul 193058.1AppointedArchpriest of the Basilica di Santa Maria Maggiore {Saint Mary Major Basilica}
12 Oct 193159.3AppointedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura
13 Mar 193360.7AppointedCardinal-Bishop of Velletri
8 May 193360.9DiedPrefect of the Apostolic Signatura

MicroData Summary for Bonaventura Cerretti:
Cardinal Bonaventura Cerretti (born , died ) Prefect of Apostolic Signatura

  • a priest for 38.1 years
  • a bishop for 18.8 years
  • a cardinal for 7.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914, Number 40

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013