Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Matthew Joseph Brodie

Deceased

Bishop of Christchurch, New Zealand


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Mar 1864Born
20 Dec 189632.8Ordained PriestPriest of Auckland, New Zealand
27 Nov 191551.7AppointedBishop of Christchurch, New Zealand
27 Feb 191651.9Ordained BishopBishop of Christchurch, New Zealand
11 Oct 194379.6DiedBishop of Christchurch, New Zealand

MicroData Summary for Matthew Joseph Brodie
Bishop Matthew Joseph Brodie (born , died ) Bishop of Christchurch

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCoromandel

  • a priest for 46.8 years
  • a bishop for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations ╔piscopales, Issue 1,916, Number 14

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast