Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Michael Lenihan, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Bishop of Auckland, New Zealand


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Sep 1858Born
27 Aug 188223.9Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
18 Jun 189637.7AppointedBishop of Auckland, New Zealand
15 Nov 189638.1Ordained BishopBishop of Auckland, New Zealand
22 Feb 191051.4DiedBishop of Auckland, New Zealand

MicroData Summary for George Michael Lenihan
Bishop George Michael Lenihan O.S.B. (born , died ) Bishop of Auckland

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLondon, Archdiocese of Westminster, England, Great Britain
Ordained BishopSt. Patrick, Cathedral, Auckland, Diocese of Auckland

  • a priest for 27.4 years
  • a bishop for 13.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1901
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 130
  • d: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 9, Page 72
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1896, Number 70

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017