Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop John Joseph Grimes, S.M. †

Deceased

Bishop of Christchurch, New Zealand


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1842Born
22 Aug 186927.5Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Mary
13 May 188745.2AppointedBishop of Christchurch, New Zealand
26 Jul 188745.4Ordained BishopBishop of Christchurch, New Zealand
15 Mar 191573.0DiedBishop of Christchurch, New Zealand

MicroData Summary for John Joseph Grimes (VIAF: 92528328)
Bishop John Joseph Grimes S.M. (born , died ) Bishop of Christchurch

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBromley-by-Bow, Archdiocese of Westminster, England, Great Britain
Ordained BishopSte Anne, London, Archdiocese of Westminster, England, Great Britain

  • a priest for 45.5 years
  • a bishop for 27.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 203
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations …piscopales, Year 1887, Number 37

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 12 Jun 2017