Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Pietro Benedetti

Deceased

Apostolic Delegate Emeritus to Cuba

Titular Archbishop of Tyrus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1867BornFalvaterra
21 Dec 188922.6Ordained PriestPriest
15 Dec 191447.6AppointedBishop of Ozieri, Italy
28 Feb 191547.8ResignedBishop-Elect of Ozieri, Italy
10 Mar 192153.8AppointedTitular Archbishop of Tyrus
10 Mar 192153.8AppointedApostolic Delegate to México
10 Apr 192153.9Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Tyrus
22 Jul 192154.2AppointedApostolic Delegate to Cuba
1926²58.6ResignedApostolic Delegate to Cuba
7 Sep 193063.3DiedApostolic Delegate Emeritus to Cuba

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain ; ⁸ Did Not Take Effect

MicroData Summary for Pietro Benedetti:
Archbishop Pietro Benedetti (born , died ) Apostolic Delegate Emeritus of Cuba

  • a priest for 40.7 years
  • a bishop for 9.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1921, Number 19
  • b: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1914
  • b: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 86

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013