Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Emilio Biancheri

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Rimini, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Jul 1908Born
30 May 193122.8Ordained PriestPriest
18 May 194940.8AppointedBishop of Sarsina, Italy
24 Jul 194941.0Ordained BishopBishop of Sarsina, Italy
7 Sep 195345.1AppointedBishop of Rimini, Italy
17 Dec 197668.4ResignedBishop of Rimini, Italy
8 Aug 198274.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Rimini, Italy

MicroData Summary for Emilio Biancheri
Bishop Emilio Biancheri (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Rimini

EventPlace
Birth PlaceVentimiglia, Diocese of Ventimiglia

  • a priest for 51.1 years
  • a bishop for 33.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 105, Number 9,141
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1949, Number 56

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast