Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Vittorio Lupi

Bishop Emeritus of Savona-Noli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Apr 1941 BornCeriana
30 May 196423.1Ordained PriestPriest of Ventimiglia, Italy
30 Nov 200766.6AppointedBishop of Savona-Noli, Italy
27 Jan 200866.8Ordained BishopBishop of Savona-Noli, Italy
1 Feb 200866.8InstalledBishop of Savona-Noli, Italy
20 Oct 201675.5RetiredBishop of Savona-Noli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Vittorio Lupi
Bishop Vittorio Lupi (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Savona-Noli

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Savona-Noli.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,667
  • r: Bollettino, 20 Oct 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 20 Oct 2016