Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Luigi Boccadoro

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Viterbo, Acquapendente, Bagnoregio, Montefiascone, Tuscania e San Martino al Monte Cimino


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1911BornSavona
26 May 193422.6Ordained PriestPriest
14 Jun 195139.6AppointedBishop of Acquapendente, Italy
14 Jun 195139.6AppointedBishop of Montefiascone, Italy
8 Sep 195139.9Ordained BishopBishop of Acquapendente, Italy
1964¹52.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Sovana e Pitigliano, Italy
1967¹55.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
1970¹58.2ResignedApostolic Administrator of Sovana e Pitigliano, Italy
8 Jun 197058.6AppointedBishop of Viterbo e Tuscania, Italy
8 Jun 197058.6AppointedApostolic Administrator of Bagnoregio (Bagnorea), Italy
27 Mar 198674.4AppointedBishop of Viterbo, Acquapendente, Bagnoregio, Montefiascone, Tuscania e San Martino al Monte Cimino, Italy
14 Mar 198775.4RetiredBishop of Viterbo, Acquapendente, Bagnoregio, Montefiascone, Tuscania e San Martino al Monte Cimino, Italy
8 Mar 199886.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Viterbo, Acquapendente, Bagnoregio, Montefiascone, Tuscania e San Martino al Monte Cimino, Italy

Note(s): ¹ Year Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Luigi Boccadoro:
Bishop Luigi Boccadoro (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Viterbo, Acquapendente, Bagnoregio, Montefiascone, Tuscania e San Martino al Monte Cimino

  • a priest for 63.8 years
  • a bishop for 46.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1951, Number 83
  • obp: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 211, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013