Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giovanni D’Ascenzi

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Arezzo-Cortona-Sansepolcro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Jan 1920BornValentano
19 Jun 194323.5Ordained PriestPriest
7 Oct 197555.8AppointedBishop of Sovana e Pitigliano, Italy
7 Dec 197555.9Ordained BishopBishop of Sovana e Pitigliano, Italy
25 Mar 198161.2AppointedBishop of Sovana-Pitigliano-Orbetello, Italy
11 Apr 198363.3AppointedBishop of Arezzo, Italy
11 Apr 198363.3AppointedBishop of Cortona, Italy
11 Apr 198363.3AppointedBishop of Sansepolcro (Borgo San Sepolcro), Italy
30 Sep 198666.7AppointedBishop of Arezzo-Cortona-Sansepolcro, Italy
8 Jun 199676.4RetiredBishop of Arezzo-Cortona-Sansepolcro, Italy
26 Feb 201393.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Arezzo-Cortona-Sansepolcro, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giovanni D’Ascenzi:
Bishop Giovanni D’Ascenzi (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Arezzo-Cortona-Sansepolcro

  • a priest for 69.7 years
  • a bishop for 37.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • d: CB, 26 Feb 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013