Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Giacomo Babini

Bishop Emeritus of Grosseto


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Feb 1929 BornAlfero
26 Jun 195324.3Ordained PriestPriest
25 Jul 198758.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Arezzo-Cortona-Sansepolcro, Italy
25 Jul 198758.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Tubunae in Mauretania
19 Sep 198758.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tubunae in Mauretania
7 Dec 199162.8AppointedBishop of Pitigliano-Sovana-Orbetello, Italy
13 Jul 199667.4AppointedBishop of Grosseto, Italy
17 Nov 200172.7ResignedBishop of Grosseto, Italy

MicroData Summary for Giacomo Babini:
Bishop Giacomo Babini (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Grosseto

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Grosseto.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 112, Number 9,905

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013