Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Benvenuto Italo Castellani

Archbishop Emeritus of Lucca, Italy


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
1 Jul 1943 Born
15 Jun 196925.9Ordained PriestPriest of Cortona, Italy
30 Sep 198643.2IncardinatedPriest of Arezzo-Cortona-Sansepolcro, Italy
19 Apr 199753.7AppointedBishop of Faenza-Modigliana, Italy
15 Jun 199753.9Ordained BishopBishop of Faenza-Modigliana, Italy
29 Jun 199753.9InstalledBishop of Faenza-Modigliana, Italy
31 May 200359.9AppointedCoadjutor Archbishop of Lucca, Italy
13 Sep 200360.1InstalledCoadjutor Archbishop of Lucca, Italy
22 Jan 200561.5SucceededArchbishop of Lucca, Italy
19 Jan 201975.5RetiredArchbishop of Lucca, Italy

MicroData Summary for Benvenuto Italo Castellani
Archbishop Benvenuto Italo Castellani (born ) Archbishop Emeritus of Lucca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCortona, Diocese of Cortona
Ordained BishopMaria SS. Assunta, Co-Cathedral, Cortona, Diocese of Arezzo-Cortona-Sansepolcro

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Lucca.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 149, Number 13,015
  • i/loc: AM, 1 Aug 2018
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.3, 16 Feb 2019; Data: 24 Feb 2019

Quantcast