Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raffaele De Giuli

Deceased

Bishop of Albenga


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Nov 1884BornLuzzogno
27 Dec 190824.1Ordained PriestPriest
17 Jun 193651.6AppointedBishop of Capaccio e Vallo della Lucania, Italy
30 Aug 193651.8Ordained BishopBishop of Capaccio e Vallo della Lucania, Italy
18 Feb 194661.3AppointedBishop of Albenga, Italy
18 Apr 196378.4DiedBishop of Albenga, Italy

MicroData Summary for Raffaele De Giuli:
Bishop Raffaele De Giuli (born , died ) Bishop of Albenga

  • a priest for 54.3 years
  • a bishop for 26.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1936, Number 59

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013