Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Dibrugarh

Dioecesis Dibrugarhensis



Show: All | General Information | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Joseph Aind, S.D.B., Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Erected: 12 July 1951
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Guwahati
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 32,545 (12,570 Square Miles)
  • Official Web Site: http://www.dioceseofdibrugarh.org/
  • Mailing Address: Bishop's House, P.O. Box 50, Dibrugarh-786001, Assam, India
  • Telephone: (0373)2324.436
  • Fax: 2321.496

Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
12 July 1951ErectedDiocese of Shillong Diocese of Dibrugarh (erected)
16 January 1964Territory LostDiocese of Dibrugarh
Diocese of Shillong
Diocese of Tezpur (erected)
29 January 1973Territory LostDiocese of Dibrugarh Diocese of Kohima-Imphal (erected)
7 December 2005Territory LostDiocese of Dibrugarh Diocese of Miao (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
196958,2913,487,0001.7%1130411,4213412114ap1971
198063,4203,834,0001.7%1420341,865219818ap1981
199088,6705,076,5001.7%4532771,1514115632ap1991
1999156,8496,500,0002.4%5048981,6007023530ap2000
2000164,4826,742,0002.4%62561181,3937826330ap2001
2001167,7717,416,2002.3%58561141,4717425630ap2004
2004175,6807,720,2112.3%62601221,4407426030ap2005
2005100,0006,063,7611.6%6615811,234824029bul7Dec05
2006101,0006,125,0001.6%60491099266424529ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 3 Feb 2014