Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Guwahati

Archidioecesis Guvahatinus



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • John Moolachira, Archbishop
  • Thomas Menamparampil, S.D.B., Archbishop Emeritus

Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 10 July 1995
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 17,551 (6,779 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: Archbishop's House, P.O. Box 100, Guwahati-781001, Assam, India
  • Telephone: (0361)2547.664
  • Fax: 2515.588

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Diocese of Guwahati
30 March 1992ErectedArchdiocese of Shillong-Gauhati
Diocese of Tezpur
Diocese of Tura
Diocese of Guwahati (erected)
Archdiocese of Guwahati
10 July 1995ElevatedDiocese of Guwahati Archdiocese of Guwahati
10 May 2000Territory LostArchdiocese of Guwahati Diocese of Bongaigaon (erected)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Archdiocese of Guwahati
1999103,64211,050,000.9%3063931,1148322032ap2000
200044,0325,757,284.8%1651676578814625ap2001
200146,5476,000,000.8%1551667056814628ap2002
200251,3456,000,000.9%1955746938415431ap2003
200353,5916,500,000.8%2158796789118433ap2004
200457,4536,600,000.9%2265876609925533ap2005
200665,7446,669,0001.0%237710065710134134ap2007

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.9, 27 Jan 2014; data: 3 Feb 2014