Date | Age | Event | Title |
---|---|---|---|
18 Jan 1948 | Born | ||
3 Feb 1975 | 27.0 | Ordained Priest | Priest |
10 Jun 1994 | 46.3 | Appointed | Bishop of Diphu, India |
8 Sep 1994 | 46.6 | Ordained Bishop | Bishop of Diphu, India |
7 Dec 2005 | 57.8 | Appointed | Bishop of Itanagar, India |
12 Mar 2006 | 58.1 | Installed | Bishop of Itanagar, India |
29 Jun 2023 | 75.4 | Retired | Bishop of Itanagar, India |
(WikiData: Q1701925)
Bishop
John Thomas
Kattrukudiyil
(born )
Bishop Emeritus
of Itanagar
|
Event | Place |
---|---|
Birth Place | Kothamangalam |
Ordained Bishop | Seigneur Ressuscité, Cathedral, Diphu, Diocese of Diphu |
Source(s):
|
Home |
Countries |
Religious Orders |
Popes |
Holy See |
Roman Curia |
Cardinals by Rank
| ||
About Catholic-Hierarchy | Terminology/Site Help | |
Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2024 Code: web_b, v3.3.5, 31 Dec 2023; Data: 25 Feb 2024 |
✠