Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Aizawl

Dioecesis Aizavlensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

  • Stephen Rotluanga, C.S.C., Bishop

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Name Changed: 11 January 1996
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Shillong
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: India
  • Square Kilometers: 28,002 (10,815 Square Miles)
  • Description: comprises the districts of Cachar, Hailakandi and Kaimkanj of Assam and the entire state of Mizoram
  • Mailing Address: Catholic Bishop's House, Ramthar Veng, P.O. Box 45, Aizawl-796001, Mizoram, India
  • Telephone: (0389) 234.71.99
  • Fax: 234.22.57

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Haflong
17 January 1952ErectedArchdiocese of Dacca Prefecture Apostolic of Haflong (erected)
Diocese of Silchar
26 June 1969ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Haflong Diocese of Silchar
11 January 1996Territory LostDiocese of Silchar Diocese of Agartala (erected)
Diocese of Aizawl
11 January 1996Name ChangedDiocese of Silchar Diocese of Aizawl

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Diocese of Silchar
198016,6093,825,000.4%91726638318711ap1981
199020,4464,519,000.5%1616326382811314ap1991
Diocese of Aizawl
199920,0763,181,893.6%221032627219417ap2000
200021,2453,181,893.7%22931685219819ap2001
200129,7943,972,965.7%2416407443510820ap2002
200220,2673,982,765.5%2415395193411220ap2003
200329,7943,972,965.7%241640744318520ap2004
200430,6184,178,874.7%2616427293111420ap2005
200632,4294,226,980.8%2920496613513820ap2007
201237,9104,585,000.8%2428527294416529ap2013

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.1, 20 Jul 2013; data: 17 Aug 2013