Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father George Daniel Joseph Breen, C.S.C. †

Deceased

Prefect Emeritus of Haflong, India


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Nov 1897Born
23 Jul 192022.7ProfessedMember of Congregation of Holy Cross
23 Jul 192325.7Solemn VowsMember of Congregation of Holy Cross
20 Jan 192426.1Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Holy Cross
21 Mar 195254.3AppointedPrefect of Haflong, India
26 Jun 196971.6ResignedPrefect of Haflong, India
26 Jan 199799.2DiedPrefect Emeritus of Haflong, India

MicroData Summary for George Daniel Joseph Breen
Father George Daniel Joseph Breen C.S.C. (born , died ) Prefect Emeritus of Haflong

EventPlace
Birth PlaceWareham, MA, USA

  • a priest for 73.0 years

Source(s):
  • b: CB, 18 Jan 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast