Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Stephen Rotluanga, C.S.C.

Bishop of Aizawl


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Jun 1952 BornAizawl
13 Dec 198129.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of Holy Cross
2 Oct 200149.3AppointedBishop of Aizawl, India
2 Feb 200249.7Ordained BishopBishop of Aizawl, India

MicroData Summary for Stephen Rotluanga:
Bishop Stephen Rotluanga C.S.C. (born ) Bishop of Aizawl

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Aizawl.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Number 14,127

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013