Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Michael Akasius Toppo

Bishop of Tezpur


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 May 1955 BornGormara
26 Jan 198630.7Ordained PriestPriest of Tezpur, India
3 Dec 200752.6AppointedBishop of Tezpur, India
2 Mar 200852.8Ordained BishopBishop of Tezpur, India

MicroData Summary for Michael Akasius Toppo:
Bishop Michael Akasius Toppo (born ) Bishop of Tezpur

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Tezpur.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Dec 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 193, Number 15,683

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013