Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop George Palliparampil (Palliparambil), S.D.B.

Bishop of Miao


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 May 1954 BornThattarathatta
20 Dec 198228.6Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
7 Dec 200551.6AppointedBishop of Miao, India
26 Feb 200651.8Ordained BishopBishop of Miao, India

MicroData Summary for George Palliparampil (Palliparambil):
Bishop George Palliparampil (Palliparambil) S.D.B. (born ) Bishop of Miao

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Miao.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 7 Dec 2005
  • b: CB
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 184, Number 15,078

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013