Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre Rossillon, M.S.F.S. †

Deceased

Bishop of Vizagapatam


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Sep 1874BornLa Biolle, France
5 Jun 189823.7Ordained PriestPriest of Missionaries of St. Francis de Sales d’Annecy
22 Aug 191843.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Vizagapatam, India
22 Aug 191843.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Epiphania in Cilicia
7 May 191944.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Epiphania in Cilicia
18 Jun 192651.7SucceededBishop of Vizagapatam, India
22 Mar 194772.5DiedBishop of Vizagapatam, India

MicroData Summary for Pierre Rossillon:
Bishop Pierre Rossillon M.S.F.S. (born , died ) Bishop of Vizagapatam

  • a priest for 48.8 years
  • a bishop for 27.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: LC
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1941
  • c2+: LC
  • op: Annuaire Pontifical Catholique, Year 1939
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1919, Number 28

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013