Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pierre-Lucien Campistron

Deceased

Bishop of Annecy, France


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Oct 1840Born
24 Sep 186423.9Ordained PriestPriest of Auch, France
13 May 190261.5SelectedBishop of Annecy, France
9 Jun 190261.6ConfirmedBishop of Annecy, France
13 Mar 190463.3Ordained BishopBishop of Annecy, France
22 Aug 192180.8DiedBishop of Annecy, France

MicroData Summary for Pierre-Lucien Campistron
Bishop Pierre-Lucien Campistron (born , died ) Bishop of Annecy

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMirande

  • a priest for 56.9 years
  • a bishop for 17.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Annuario Pontificio, Year 1921
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica, Volume 8, Page 105
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1904, Number 9

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 9 Jan 2017