Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Louis Petit, A.A. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Athēnai {Athens}

Titular Archbishop of Corinthus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Feb 1868BornViuz-la-Chiésaz, France
15 Aug 188719.5ProfessedMember of Augustinians of the Assumption
15 Aug 189123.5Ordained PriestPriest of Augustinians of the Assumption
4 Mar 191244.0AppointedArchbishop of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece
4 Mar 191244.0AppointedApostolic Delegate to Greece
25 Apr 191244.2Ordained BishopArchbishop of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece
24 Jun 192658.3ResignedArchbishop of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece
24 Jun 192658.3AppointedTitular Archbishop of Corinthus
5 Nov 192759.7DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Athēnai {Athens}, Greece

MicroData Summary for Louis Petit:
Archbishop Louis Petit A.A. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Athēnai {Athens}

  • a priest for 36.2 years
  • a bishop for 15.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1912, Number 27
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 71

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013