Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jules-Alexandre Cusin

Deceased

Bishop of Mende


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Sep 1869BornFeigères
28 Oct 189223.1Ordained PriestPriest of Annecy, France
8 Mar 192050.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Mende, France
8 Mar 192050.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Nyssa
21 Apr 192050.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nyssa
29 May 192959.7SucceededBishop of Mende, France
5 Jun 193767.7DiedBishop of Mende, France

MicroData Summary for Jules-Alexandre Cusin:
Bishop Jules-Alexandre Cusin (born , died ) Bishop of Mende

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: LC
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1920, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013