Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos de Sá Fragoso

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of São Tomé of Meliapore

Titular Bishop of Pitanae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Apr 1876BornTirso
23 Oct 189822.4Ordained PriestPriest
4 Dec 193357.6AppointedBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
28 Jan 193457.7Ordained BishopBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
10 Apr 193760.9ResignedBishop of São Tomé of Meliapore, India
10 Apr 193760.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Pitanae
28 Aug 194872.3DiedBishop Emeritus of São Tomé of Meliapore, India

MicroData Summary for Carlos de Sá Fragoso:
Bishop Carlos de Sá Fragoso (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of São Tomé of Meliapore

  • a priest for 49.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1934, Number 8

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015