Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Próspero da Ascensão Puaty

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lwena


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Apr 1928BornImanya
17 Jul 195729.3Ordained PriestPriest
3 Feb 197748.8AppointedBishop of Lwena, Angola
17 Apr 197749.0Ordained BishopBishop of Lwena, Angola
7 Jun 200072.2ResignedBishop of Lwena, Angola
12 Oct 200173.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Lwena, Angola

MicroData Summary for José Próspero da Ascensão Puaty:
Bishop José Próspero da Ascensão Puaty (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lwena

  • a priest for 44.2 years
  • a bishop for 24.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 166, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013