Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Mário Lucunde

Bishop Emeritus of Menongue, Angola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 May 1957 Born
3 Feb 198527.7Ordained PriestPriest of Benguela, Angola
3 Aug 200548.2AppointedBishop of Menongue, Angola
9 Oct 200548.4Ordained BishopBishop of Menongue, Angola
16 Oct 200548.4InstalledBishop of Menongue, Angola
12 Mar 201860.8ResignedBishop of Menongue, Angola

MicroData Summary for Mário Lucunde
Bishop Mário Lucunde (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Menongue

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCaimbambo
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora de Navegantes, Chapel, Benguela, Diocese of Benguela

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Menongue.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Aug 2005
  • ob: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 183, Number 14,999
  • r: Bollettino, 12 Mar 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast