Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Serafim Shyngo-Ya-Hombo, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop Emeritus of Mbanza Congo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Feb 1945 BornKibala
1 Aug 197126.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
26 Mar 199045.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Luanda, Angola
26 Mar 199045.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae in Dacia
24 Jun 199045.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae in Dacia
29 May 199247.3AppointedBishop of Mbanza Congo, Angola
17 Jul 200863.4ResignedBishop of Mbanza Congo, Angola

MicroData Summary for Serafim Shyngo-Ya-Hombo:
Bishop Serafim Shyngo-Ya-Hombo O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Mbanza Congo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mbanza Congo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 17 Jul 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 130, Number 11,632

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013