Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archdiocese of Windhoek

Archidioecesis Vindhoekensis



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)


Suffragan Dioceses

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Archdiocese
  • Elevated: 14 March 1994
  • Metropolitan See
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • Country: Namibia
  • Square Kilometers: 560,158 (216,361 Square Miles)
  • Mailing Address: P.O. Box 272, Windhoek 9000, Namibia
  • Telephone: (061)22.83.76; 22.34.30
  • Fax: 22.98.36

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Prefecture Apostolic of Cimbebasia Inferiore
1 August 1892ErectedPrefecture Apostolic of Cimbebasia Prefecture Apostolic of Cimbebasia Inferiore (erected)
Prefecture Apostolic of Cimbebasia
10 January 1921Name ChangedPrefecture Apostolic of Cimbebasia Inferiore Prefecture Apostolic of Cimbebasia
Vicariate Apostolic of Windhoek
11 May 1926ElevatedPrefecture Apostolic of Cimbebasia Vicariate Apostolic of Windhoek
2 April 1959Territory LostDiocese of Bulawayo
Diocese of Kimberley
Vicariate Apostolic of Windhoek
Prefecture Apostolic of Bechuanaland (erected)
14 March 1994Territory LostVicariate Apostolic of Windhoek Vicariate Apostolic of Rundu (erected)
Archdiocese of Windhoek
14 March 1994ElevatedVicariate Apostolic of Windhoek Archdiocese of Windhoek

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Vicariate Apostolic of Windhoek
195020,966220,0009.5%13940524681648ap1951
196981,119550,00014.7%252541,5029624140ap1971
1980129,066823,00015.7%240423,07378632642ap1981
1990219,5881,300,00016.9%434385,778187323031ap1991
Archdiocese of Windhoek
1999166,0221,700,0009.8%925344,883184321636ap2000
2000176,0521,700,00010.4%730374,758205418261ap2001
2001181,3461,700,00010.7%1232444,121205718361ap2002
2002233,9141,700,00013.8%1233455,198246619261ap2003
2003239,7021,700,00014.1%1234465,210246520663ap2004
2004246,6541,800,00013.7%1232445,605235931261ap2005
2010278,8222,222,32212.5%1846644,356246238371ap2011

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2012
code: v2.8.1, 5 Sep 2012; data: 20 Oct 2012