Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Liborius Ndumbukuti Nashenda, O.M.I.

Archbishop of Windhoek


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Apr 1959 BornOshikuku
25 Jun 198829.2Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
5 Nov 199839.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Windhoek, Namibia
5 Nov 199839.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Pertusa
7 Feb 199939.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pertusa
21 Sep 200445.5AppointedArchbishop of Windhoek, Namibia
14 Nov 200445.6InstalledArchbishop of Windhoek, Namibia

MicroData Summary for Liborius Ndumbukuti Nashenda:
Archbishop Liborius Ndumbukuti Nashenda O.M.I. (born ) Archbishop of Windhoek

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Windhoek.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,473

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013