Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Fernando Guimarães Kevanu

Bishop Emeritus of Ondjiva


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Aug 1936 BornOdime
2 Jul 197033.8Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jan 198851.4AppointedBishop of Ondjiva, Angola
3 Jul 198851.8Ordained BishopBishop of Ondjiva, Angola
23 Nov 201175.2RetiredBishop of Ondjiva, Angola

MicroData Summary for Fernando Guimarães Kevanu:
Bishop Fernando Guimarães Kevanu (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Ondjiva

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ondjiva.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 118, Number 10,562
  • r: Bollettino, 23 Nov 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015