Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Leopoldo Ndakalako

Bishop of Menongue, Angola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1968 Born
14 Dec 199729.0Ordained PriestPriest of Ondjiva, Angola
19 Mar 201950.2AppointedBishop of Menongue, Angola
12 May 201950.4Ordained BishopBishop of Menongue, Angola
26 May 201950.4InstalledBishop of Menongue, Angola

MicroData Summary for Leopoldo Ndakalako
Bishop Leopoldo Ndakalako (born ) Bishop of Menongue

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOhakaonde
Ordained PriestOmupanda
Ordained Bishopesplanade Nossa Senhora das Graças, Ondjiva, Diocese of Ondjiva

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Menongue.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Mar 2019
  • ob/i: CB, 31 Mar 2019
  • c2+: CB, 12 May 2019
  • c1: CB, 13 May 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 14 May 2019

Quantcast