Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pio Hipunyati

Bishop of Ondjiva, Angola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Nov 1964 Born
5 Dec 199834.0Ordained PriestPriest of Ondjiva, Angola
23 Nov 201147.0AppointedBishop of Ondjiva, Angola
19 Feb 201247.2Ordained BishopBishop of Ondjiva, Angola
12 Mar 201853.3AppointedApostolic Administrator of Menongue, Angola
26 May 201954.5CeasedApostolic Administrator of Menongue, Angola

MicroData Summary for Pio Hipunyati
Bishop Pio Hipunyati (born ) Bishop of Ondjiva

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOunonge
Ordained BishopOndijiva, Diocese of Ondjiva

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Ondjiva.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Nov 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 7 Jan 2012
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 209, Number 17,263
  • aadm: CB, 3 Jan 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.6, 19 Dec 2019; Data: 5 Jan 2020

Quantcast