Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Dionísio Hisiilenapo

Bishop of Namibe, Angola


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Oct 1966 Born
6 Dec 199832.1Ordained PriestPriest of Ondjiva, Angola
8 Jul 201144.7AppointedBishop of Namibe, Angola
4 Sep 201144.9Ordained BishopBishop of Namibe, Angola
18 Sep 201144.9InstalledBishop of Namibe, Angola

MicroData Summary for Dionísio Hisiilenapo
Bishop Dionísio Hisiilenapo (born ) Bishop of Namibe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEpumbu
Ordained BishopOndjiva, Diocese of Ondjiva

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Namibe.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 Jul 2011
  • ob/i: CB, 3 Aug 2011
  • c2: CB, 31 Aug 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,134
  • ln: JI, 1 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast