Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Philipp Pöllitzer, O.M.I.

Bishop Emeritus of Keetmanshoop, Namibia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1940 Born
196019.9ProfessedMember of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
17 Dec 196525.9Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
31 May 200767.3AppointedBishop of Keetmanshoop, Namibia
14 Jul 200767.4Ordained BishopBishop of Keetmanshoop, Namibia
21 Jul 201777.5RetiredBishop of Keetmanshoop, Namibia

MicroData Summary for Philipp Pöllitzer (VIAF: 68662418)
Bishop Philipp Pöllitzer O.M.I. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Keetmanshoop

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMörtelsdorf, Austria

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Keetmanshoop.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 31 May 2007
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 190, Number 15,480
  • r: Bollettino, 21 Jul 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018