Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Rudolf Johannes Maria Koppmann, O.M.I. †

Deceased

Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Windhoek

Titular Bishop of Dalisandus in Pamphylia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jan 1913BornEssen, Germany
10 Apr 193825.2Ordained PriestPriest of Oblates of Mary Immaculate
26 Jan 195744.0AppointedCoadjutor Vicar Apostolic of Windhoek, Namibia
26 Jan 195744.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Dalisandus in Pamphylia
11 May 195744.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dalisandus in Pamphylia
20 Mar 196148.2SucceededVicar Apostolic of Windhoek, Namibia
29 Nov 198067.9ResignedVicar Apostolic of Windhoek, Namibia
24 Jun 200794.4DiedVicar Apostolic Emeritus of Windhoek, Namibia

MicroData Summary for Rudolf Johannes Maria Koppmann:
Bishop Rudolf Johannes Maria Koppmann O.M.I. (born , died ) Vicar Apostolic Emeritus of Windhoek

  • a priest for 69.2 years
  • a bishop for 50.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013