Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adolf Bolte

Deceased

Bishop of Fulda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Nov 1901BornHannover
24 Mar 192826.4Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
193533.1IncardinatedPriest of Fulda, Germany
22 Feb 194543.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Fulda, Germany
22 Feb 194543.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Cibyra
29 Jun 194543.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cibyra
30 Jun 195957.6AppointedBishop of Fulda, Germany
2 Aug 195957.7InstalledBishop of Fulda, Germany
5 Apr 197472.4DiedBishop of Fulda, Germany

MicroData Summary for Adolf Bolte:
Bishop Adolf Bolte (born , died ) Bishop of Fulda

  • a priest for 46.0 years
  • a bishop for 28.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1945, Number 32

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013