Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul Heinrich Nordhues

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paderborn

Titular Bishop of Cos


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Feb 1915BornDortmund
23 Mar 194126.1Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
5 Jun 196146.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
5 Jun 196146.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Cos
24 Aug 196146.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cos
1 Mar 199075.1RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
30 Jun 200489.4DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paderborn, Germany

MicroData Summary for Paul Heinrich Nordhues:
Bishop Paul Heinrich Nordhues (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Paderborn

  • a priest for 63.3 years
  • a bishop for 42.8 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c2+: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013