Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Paul-Werner Scheele

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Würzburg, Germany


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
6 Apr 1928Born
29 Mar 195223.9Ordained PriestPriest of Paderborn, Germany
20 Jan 197546.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Paderborn, Germany
20 Jan 197546.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Druas
9 Mar 197546.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Druas
31 Aug 197951.4AppointedBishop of Würzburg, Germany
21 Oct 197951.5InstalledBishop of Würzburg, Germany
14 Jul 200375.2RetiredBishop of Würzburg, Germany
10 May 201991.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Würzburg, Germany

MicroData Summary for Paul-Werner Scheele (VIAF: 34496978)
Bishop Paul-Werner Scheele (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Würzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceOlpe
Ordained BishopSt. Maria, St. Liborius, St. Kilian, Cathedral, Paderborn, Archdiocese of Paderborn
Death PlaceWürzburg, Diocese of Würzburg

  • a priest for 67.1 years
  • a bishop for 44.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 168, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: CB, 10 May 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 29, Number 1,657

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast