Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ulrich Boom

Auxiliary Bishop of Würzburg, Germany

Titular Bishop of Sullectum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Sep 1947 Born
27 Jul 198335.8Ordained DeaconDeacon of Würzburg, Germany
25 Feb 198436.4Ordained PriestPriest of Würzburg, Germany
6 Dec 200861.1AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Würzburg, Germany
6 Dec 200861.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Sullectum
25 Jan 200961.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Sullectum

MicroData Summary for Ulrich Boom
Bishop Ulrich Boom (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Würzburg

EventPlace
Birth PlaceAlsstätte

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Würzburg.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 6 Dec 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 197, Number 16,049

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018