Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alfred Cardinal Bengsch

Deceased

Bishop of Berlin

Cardinal-Priest of San Filippo Neri in Eurosia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1921BornBerlin
2 Apr 195028.6Ordained PriestPriest of Berlin, Germany
2 May 195937.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Berlin, Germany
2 May 195937.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Tubia
11 Jun 195937.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tubia
16 Aug 196139.9AppointedBishop of Berlin, Germany
14 Jan 196240.3AppointedArchbishop (Personal Title) of Berlin, Germany
26 Jun 196745.8Elevated to Cardinal
26 Jun 196745.8AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Filippo Neri in Eurosia
13 Dec 197958.3DiedBishop of Berlin, Germany

MicroData Summary for Alfred Bengsch:
Cardinal Alfred Bengsch (born , died ) Bishop of Berlin

  • a priest for 29.7 years
  • a bishop for 20.5 years
  • a cardinal for 12.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • c3+: CB
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 51
  • b: The Cardinals of the Holy Roman Church

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013