Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Peter Stephan Zurbriggen

Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus to Austria

Titular Archbishop of Glastonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Aug 1943 Born
10 Oct 196926.1Ordained PriestPriest
13 Nov 199350.2AppointedTitular Archbishop of Glastonia
13 Nov 199350.2AppointedApostolic Delegate to Mozambique
6 Jan 199450.3Ordained BishopTitular Archbishop of Glastonia
22 Feb 199652.4AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Mozambique
13 Jun 199854.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Georgia
13 Jun 199854.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Azerbaijan
13 Jun 199854.7AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Armenia
25 Oct 200158.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Lithuania
25 Oct 200158.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Estonia
25 Oct 200158.1AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Latvia
15 Nov 200158.2AppointedApostolic Administrator of Estonia
23 Mar 200561.5ResignedApostolic Administrator of Estonia
14 Jan 200965.3AppointedApostolic Nuncio to Austria
30 Nov 201875.2RetiredApostolic Nuncio to Austria

MicroData Summary for Peter Stephan Zurbriggen
Archbishop Peter Stephan Zurbriggen (born ) Apostolic Nuncio Emeritus of Austria

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBrig, Switzerland
Ordained BishopSan Pietro, Basilica, Roma, Diocese of Roma {Rome}, Italy

Please contact the Archbishop through the Nunciature to Austria.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Jan 2009
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 136, Number 12,186
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • r: CB, 1 Dec 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 2 Dec 2018

Quantcast