Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Chuanguira Machado

Bishop Emeritus of Gurué


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Jun 1950 BornBanaze
13 Dec 198131.5Ordained PriestPriest
6 Dec 199343.5AppointedBishop of Gurué, Mozambique
22 May 199443.9Ordained BishopBishop of Gurué, Mozambique
9 Oct 200959.3ResignedBishop of Gurué, Mozambique

MicroData Summary for Manuel Chuanguira Machado:
Bishop Manuel Chuanguira Machado (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Gurué

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gurué.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 9 Oct 2009
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 140, Number 12,425
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013