Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Jaime Pedro Gonçalves

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Beira


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1936BornManica
17 Dec 196731.0Ordained PriestPriest of Beira, Mozambique
19 Dec 197539.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Beira, Mozambique
19 Dec 197539.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Ficus
28 Mar 197639.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ficus
3 Dec 197640.0SucceededBishop of Beira, Mozambique
4 Jun 198447.5AppointedArchbishop of Beira, Mozambique
14 Jan 201275.1RetiredArchbishop of Beira, Mozambique
6 Apr 201679.3DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Beira, Mozambique

MicroData Summary for Jaime Pedro Gonçalves
Archbishop Jaime Pedro Gonçalves (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Beira

  • a priest for 48.3 years
  • a bishop for 40.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 14 Jan 2012
  • d: CB, 6 Apr 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.3, 5 Feb 2016; Data: 7 Apr 2016