Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Alberto Setele

Deceased

Bishop of Inhambane


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Nov 1935BornZavala
9 Aug 196428.7Ordained PriestPriest of Inhambane, Mozambique
20 Nov 197539.9AppointedBishop of Inhambane, Mozambique
8 Feb 197640.2Ordained BishopBishop of Inhambane, Mozambique
7 Sep 200670.7DiedBishop of Inhambane, Mozambique

MicroData Summary for Alberto Setele:
Bishop Alberto Setele (born , died ) Bishop of Inhambane

  • a priest for 42.0 years
  • a bishop for 30.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 187, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015