Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Alexandre José Maria Cardinal dos Santos, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Archbishop Emeritus of Maputo, Mozambique

Cardinal-Priest of San Frumenzio ai Prati Fiscali


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Mar 1924Born
17 Sep 194824.4ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
1951²26.7Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor
25 Jun 195329.2Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
23 Dec 197450.7AppointedArchbishop of Lourenço Marques, Mozambique
9 Mar 197550.9Ordained BishopArchbishop of Lourenço Marques, Mozambique
28 Jun 198864.2Elevated to Cardinal
28 Jun 198864.2AppointedCardinal-Priest of San Frumenzio ai Prati Fiscali
22 Feb 200378.9RetiredArchbishop of Maputo, Mozambique
29 Sep 202197.5DiedArchbishop Emeritus of Maputo, Mozambique

Note(s): ² Month Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Alexandre José Maria dos Santos (VIAF: 290646268)
Alexandre José Maria Cardinal dos Santos O.F.M. (born , died ) Archbishop Emeritus of Maputo

EventPlace
Birth PlaceZavala
Ordained PriestLisboa, Patriarchate of Lisboa {Lisbon}, Portugal
Ordained BishopSports Pavilion, Lourenço Marques, Archdiocese of Lourenço Marques
Death PlaceInstituto de Coração (ICOR), Maputo, Archdiocese of Maputo

  • a priest for 68.2 years
  • a bishop for 46.5 years
  • a cardinal for 33.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 142
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 28, Number 1,607
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 29, Number 1,658
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 30, Number 1,711
  • c1/prof: CB, 26 Mar 2021
  • d: CB, 29 Sep 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 30 Sep 2021

Quantcast