Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Adriano Langa, O.F.M.

Bishop of Inhambane, Mozambique


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
25 Oct 1946 Born
21 Nov 198236.0Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
24 Oct 199750.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Maputo, Mozambique
24 Oct 199750.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Baia
22 Feb 199851.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Baia
1 Apr 200558.4AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Inhambane, Mozambique
7 Sep 200659.8SucceededBishop of Inhambane, Mozambique

MicroData Summary for Adriano Langa
Bishop Adriano Langa O.F.M. (born ) Bishop of Inhambane

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMacupulana

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Inhambane.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c23: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 151, Number 13,244
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 152, Additions/Corrections (front)
  • c34: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 153, Additions/Corrections (front)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 2 Jan 2017