Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Joćo Carlos Hatoa Nunes

Bishop of Chimoio, Mozambique


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
8 Mar 1968 Born
17 Jul 199527.3Ordained PriestPriest of Maputo, Mozambique
25 May 201143.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Maputo, Mozambique
25 May 201143.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Amudarsa
10 Jul 201143.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Amudarsa
14 Jan 201243.8AppointedApostolic Administrator of Beira, Mozambique
29 Jun 201244.3CeasedApostolic Administrator of Beira, Mozambique
2 Jan 201748.8AppointedBishop of Chimoio, Mozambique

MicroData Summary for Joćo Carlos Hatoa Nunes
Bishop Joćo Carlos Hatoa Nunes (born ) Bishop of Chimoio

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBeira

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Chimoio.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 25 May 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 11 Jul 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 207, Number 17,113
  • ab: Bollettino, 14 Jan 2012
  • ab: Bollettino, 2 Jan 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.5, 27 Dec 2016; Data: 2 Jan 2017